OK HB2800 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Probate procedure; authorizing an executor or administrator to have control of certain social networking, microblogging or e-mail accounts of the deceased. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probate procedure; authorizing an executor or administrator to have control of certain social networking, microblogging or e-mail accounts of the deceased. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-11 - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-29 Approved by Governor 04/28/2010
2010-04-26 Sent to Governor
2010-04-26 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2010-04-22 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2010-04-21 Referred for enrollment
2010-04-21 Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
2010-04-21 Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2010-04-21 General Order, Considered
2010-03-31 Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2010-03-30 Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR
2010-03-17 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2010-03-15 First Reading
2010-03-15 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-03-11 Referred for engrossment
2010-03-11 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 0
2010-03-11 Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman, Murphey
2010-03-11 General Order
2010-02-23 Authored by Senator Rice (principal Senate author)
2010-02-23 CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2010-02-02 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2010-02-01 Authored by Representative Kiesel
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
58269Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback