OK HB2796 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Adding duty of Oklahoma Health Care Authority to support and reinforce intact families; effective date.
Title
Adding duty of Oklahoma Health Care Authority to support and reinforce intact families; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Public Health committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Public Health committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Motion expired |
2014-03-11 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McCullough |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 15 |
2014-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McCullough |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |