OK HB2790 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Probate procedure; summary administration; expanding timing for final hearing; emergency.
Title
Probate procedure; summary administration; expanding timing for final hearing; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2014 |
2014-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2014-02-26 | House | Amended |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | General Order |
2014-02-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McCullough |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |