OK HB2753 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2753
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health; vulnerable adult abuse; Office of the Attorney General; registry; information; effective date.
Title
Mental health; vulnerable adult abuse; Office of the Attorney General; registry; information; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Miller [R] | Sen. Darrell Weaver [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] |
Rep. Max Wolfley [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Approved by Governor 05/11/2023 |
2023-05-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-05-10 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wolfley, Stark |
2023-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2023-04-20 | House | SA's received |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lawson |
2023-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-07 | House | General Order |
2023-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2023-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Miller |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2753 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2023