OK HB2740 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Approved by Governor 04/07/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Approved by Governor 04/07/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Teachers' Retirement System; Board of Trustees; membership; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public retirement systems; Teachers' Retirement System; Board of Trustees; membership; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Approved by Governor 04/07/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-31 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Pensions committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2014-02-27 | Senate | coauthored by Hoskin |
2014-02-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Henke |
2014-02-26 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Ellis (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Curtis) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |