OK HB2656 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Employment Security Commission; appropriations; purposes; effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Employment Security Commission; appropriations; purposes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 6 |
2014-02-25 | House | General Order |
2014-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Wesselhoft |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |