OK HB2586 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Human Services; Oklahoma Personnel Act; extending trial period for certain Department employees; effective date.
Title
Department of Human Services; Oklahoma Personnel Act; extending trial period for certain Department employees; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Human Services committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Human Services committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2014-02-18 | House | General Order |
2014-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Human Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Ownbey |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |