OK HB2574 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
Pending: Senate Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
American Indian Arts and Crafts Sales Act of 1974; modifying definitions; effective date.
Title
American Indian Arts and Crafts Sales Act of 1974; modifying definitions; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Billy |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hoskin |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |