OK HB2561 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public finance; pay increases; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; pay increases; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-19 - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2014-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Dank
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback