OK HB2511 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; relating to exemptions from sales tax; replacing amendatory provisions related to certain aircraft maintenance facility structures; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; relating to exemptions from sales tax; replacing amendatory provisions related to certain aircraft maintenance facility structures; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax committee meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax committee meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Sears |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |