OK HB2418 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Modifying requirements for persons allowed to perform or induce abortions; effective date.
Title
Modifying requirements for persons allowed to perform or induce abortions; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Rebecca Hamilton [D] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Rep. David Brumbaugh [R] | Rep. Dan Fisher [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Public Health committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Public Health committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Fisher, Hamilton |
2014-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2014-02-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 9 |
2014-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Johnson, Brumbaugh, Kern |
2014-02-27 | House | General Order |
2014-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Ritze |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |