OK HB2228 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; criminal history record checks for certain volunteers; effective date.
Title
Schools; criminal history record checks for certain volunteers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) David |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-14 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Public Safety |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan |
2013-03-14 | House | General Order |
2013-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Dorman |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |