OK HB1984 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State property; creating working group to study automobiles managed by the state; Fleet Management; modifying duties of the Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services.
Title
State property; creating working group to study automobiles managed by the state; Fleet Management; modifying duties of the Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2013 |
2013-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-09 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 |
2013-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2013-04-22 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2013-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Sherrer |
2013-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 |
2013-02-28 | House | General Order |
2013-02-18 | House | Emergency removed |
2013-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Murphey |
2013-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Brumbaugh |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |