OK HB1907 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Remove Representative Cleveland as principal House author and substitute with Representative Blackwell
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Schools; creating the Common Core Task Force; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating the Common Core Task Force; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-27 - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-28HouseRemove Representative Cleveland as principal House author and substitute with Representative Blackwell
2013-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2013-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2013-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Cleveland
2013-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback