OK HB1882 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to higher education instructional materials; modifying definitions; adding definitions; modifying requirement to submit a list of revisions to instructional materials. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; relating to higher education instructional materials; modifying definitions; adding definitions; modifying requirement to submit a list of revisions to instructional materials. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Approved by Governor 04/17/2009 | |
2009-04-13 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-13 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-09 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-08 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-30 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 | |
2009-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shumate | |
2009-03-03 | General Order | |
2009-02-25 | Emergency added | |
2009-02-25 | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2009-02-25 | Remove Representative Hickman as principal House author and substitute with Representative Jordan | |
2009-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Higher Education and Career Tech Committee | |
2009-02-17 | Withdrawn from Common Education Committee | |
2009-02-16 | Referred to Common Education Committee | |
2009-02-16 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Hickman | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3241 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |