OK HB1828 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Measure failed: Ayes: 8 Nays: 37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Measure failed: Ayes: 8 Nays: 37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; creating the Professions Residential and Commercial Builders Registration Act; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; creating the Professions Residential and Commercial Builders Registration Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Rep. Shane Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 8 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-09 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 19 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 19 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 8 Nays: 37 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Moore |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 34 |
2015-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-10 | House | Amended |
2015-03-10 | House | General Order |
2015-03-09 | House | Laid over |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order |
2015-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 60 Nays: 10 |
2015-03-05 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Martin |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 47 |
2015-03-05 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2015-03-05 | House | Amended |
2015-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Osborn, Stone |
2015-03-05 | House | General Order |
2015-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2015-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Martin |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1000 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1160 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |