OK HB1828 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act; modifying various provisions; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act; modifying various provisions; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended, considered and deferred |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-06 | House | General Order |
2013-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Armes |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 2095 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |