OK HB1794 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 74-30)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 74-30)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State employee compensation; findings related to compensation and benefits; inapplicability to certain modifications or implementation related to retirement; effective date.
Title
State employee compensation; findings related to compensation and benefits; inapplicability to certain modifications or implementation related to retirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 62 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House: ADOPT AMENDMENT (Y: 62 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 27 Nays: 14 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | 2 CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-23 | Senate | 2 CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-22 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2014-05-22 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | House | Emergency removed |
2014-05-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Newberry |
2014-05-21 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Shelton, Hoskin, Condit |
2014-05-21 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Further conference granted, GCCA |
2014-05-16 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on General Government |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR rejected, further conference requested, naming conferees |
2013-05-22 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2013-05-22 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-22 | House | Remove Senator Jolley as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Shortey |
2013-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-22 | Senate | SCs named Jolley, Justice, Brinkley, Griffin, Burrage, Sparks |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference |
2013-05-14 | House | HC's named: Christian, Osborn, Jordan, Johnson, Echols, Newell, Henke, Kirby, Fourkiller, Scott |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-08 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2013-03-14 | House | Amended |
2013-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey, Lockhart, Hoskin, Condit, McDaniel (Jeannie), Shelton |
2013-03-14 | House | General Order |
2013-02-28 | House | Emergency added |
2013-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Christian |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 840 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 45j | Amended Code | See Bill Text |