OK HB1660 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/31/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; modifying the Education Leadership Oklahoma program; modifying the Oklahoma Commission for Teacher Preparation; effective date.
Title
Schools; modifying the Education Leadership Oklahoma program; modifying the Oklahoma Commission for Teacher Preparation; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ford [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. Ann Coody [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 60 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 49 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 60 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 49 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | House | Approved by Governor 05/31/2013 |
2013-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 28 Nays: 12 |
2013-05-24 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-24 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2013-05-24 | House | Ayes: 56 Nays: 20 |
2013-05-24 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2013-05-23 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Denney |
2013-05-23 | House | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 30; Ayes: 57 Nays: 21 |
2013-05-23 | House | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-23 | House | House Rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR ruled nongermane |
2013-05-21 | House | CCR considered |
2013-05-20 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2013-05-20 | House | Title restored |
2013-05-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Coody |
2013-05-20 | House | CCR submitted, GCCA |
2013-05-02 | House | HC's named: GCCA |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 6 |
2013-03-07 | House | Considered |
2013-03-07 | House | Laid over |
2013-03-07 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 58 Nays: 6 |
2013-03-06 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Denney |
2013-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 49 Nays: 45 |
2013-03-06 | House | General Order |
2013-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-25 | House | Title stricken |
2013-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Denney |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 18 | 114 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 18 | 200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 18 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 3 | 145 | New Code | See Bill Text |