OK HB1548 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Marriage; dissolution of marriage; restricting the use of incompatibility as a ground for divorce; effective date.
Title
Marriage; dissolution of marriage; restricting the use of incompatibility as a ground for divorce; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred to Government Modernization Committee |
2014-02-17 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCullough |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |