OK HB1532 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Amusements and sports; modifying distribution of unclaimed prize monies to Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; effective date; emergency.
Title
Amusements and sports; modifying distribution of unclaimed prize monies to Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Tourism and International Relations Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Tourism and International Relations Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2013 |
2013-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 5 |
2013-03-07 | House | General Order |
2013-02-07 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and International Relations Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism and International Relations |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Banz |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |