OK HB1048 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1048
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children; authorizing court to establish a Minor's Public Guardianship; motion; notice of hearing; visitation; effective date.
Title
Children; authorizing court to establish a Minor's Public Guardianship; motion; notice of hearing; visitation; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2024-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Title stricken |
2024-03-04 | House | Amended |
2024-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-04 | House | General Order |
2024-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2024-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1048 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules