OK HB1009 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Torts; limitation on landowner liability; modifying definitions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Torts; limitation on landowner liability; modifying definitions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-02 - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HouseApproved by Governor 05/10/2013
2013-05-06HouseSent to Governor
2013-05-06SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2013-05-06HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2013-05-02HouseReferred for enrollment
2013-05-02HouseMeasure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2013-05-02HouseSA's read, adopted
2013-04-24HouseSA's received
2013-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2013-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2013-04-23SenateTitle restored
2013-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2013-04-18Senatecoauthored by Johnson (Constance)
2013-03-19SenateTitle stricken
2013-03-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2013-03-12SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2013-02-25Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2013-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2013-02-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-02-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-02-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0
2013-02-21HouseGeneral Order
2013-02-13HouseAuthored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author)
2013-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2013-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2013-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Brown
2013-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76101New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback