OK HB1001 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; relating to the Employment Security Act of 1980; exemptions from coverage; taxation; unemployment benefit claims; effective date.
Title
Labor; relating to the Employment Security Act of 1980; exemptions from coverage; taxation; unemployment benefit claims; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor 05/06/2015 |
2015-04-30 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-30 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-29 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 5 |
2015-04-29 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 4 |
2015-02-17 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 1 | 210 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 228 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 417 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 420 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 618 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 619 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 802 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 112 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 511 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 4 | 318 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 4 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 4 | 508 | New Code | See Bill Text |