OH SCR4 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
As Introduced 129th General AssemblyRegular Session2011-2012S. C. R. No. 4 Senator Daniels
Title
As Introduced 129th General AssemblyRegular Session2011-2012S. C. R. No. 4 Senator Daniels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - House - House - Resolution Adoption (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Concurrence | |
2011-03-30 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-03-24 | Committee Report | |
2011-02-15 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced to House | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Committee Report | |
2011-03-31 | To Public Utilities | |
2011-03-31 | Introduced to Senate |