OH SCR33 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-30)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Smith-Lever Act of 1914 on its
Title
Honoring the Smith-Lever Act of 1914 on its
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2014-04-08 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-04-08 | Committee Report | |
2014-02-13 | To Agriculture | |
2014-02-13 | Introduced to House | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-27 | Committee Report | |
2014-04-09 | To Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2014-04-09 | Introduced to Senate |