OH SB9 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-5)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective 7/1/21 - Provisions effective July 1, 2021; Act effective April 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 40-5)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective 7/1/21 - Provisions effective July 1, 2021; Act effective April 12, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3904.13 and to enact section 3901.89 of the Revised Code to require health plan issuers to release certain claim information to group plan policyholders.
Title
Release claim information to group health plan policyholders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 0 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-12-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Effective 7/1/21 - Provisions effective July 1, 2021; Act effective April 12, 2021 | |
2020-12-17 | House | Conference report agreed to |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to: Conference Committee on S.B. 9 |
2020-05-20 | House | Conference managers: Reps. - Merrin, Cross, Boggs: Conference Committee on S.B. 9 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Conference managers: Sens. - Dolan, Huffman, M., Craig |
2020-03-05 | House | Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Refused to concur in House amendments |
2019-12-11 | House | Passed |
2019-12-11 | House | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2019-10-29 | House | Re-referred: Insurance |
2019-10-29 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported - Amended: Insurance |
2019-04-02 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | 89 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 04 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |