OH SB86 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 19 2010 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-19 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To enact section 2305.2310 of the Revised Code to grant qualified civil immunity to a physician, physician assistant, dentist, or optometrist who provides emergency medical services, first-aid treatment, or other emergency professional care in compliance with the federal Emergency Medical Treatment and Active Labor Act or as a result of a disaster and to a certified nurse-midwife, certified nurse practitioner, clinical nurse specialist, or registered nurse who provides emergency services, first-aid treatment, or other emergency professional care as a result of a disaster and to provide that these provisions do not apply to wrongful death actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To grant qualified civil immunity to a physician, physician assistant, dentist, or optometrist who provides emergency medical services, first-aid treatment, or other emergency professional care in compliance with the federal Emergency Medical Treatment and Active Labor Act or as a result of a disaster and to a certified nurse-midwife, certified nurse practitioner, clinical nurse specialist, or registered nurse who provides emergency services, first-aid treatment, or other emergency professional care as a result of a disaster and to provide that these provisions do not apply to wrongful death actions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-05-19 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-19 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2010-05-13 Committee Report - S
2009-03-25 To Judiciary Civil Justice
2009-03-25 Introduced to House
2010-05-20 To Civil & Commercial Law
2010-05-20 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23New CodeSee Bill Text
2305New CodeSee Bill Text
23052310New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback