OH SB72 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2305.11, 2307.52, 2919.16, and 4731.22, to enact new sections 2919.17 and 2919.18, to enact section 2919.171, and to repeal sections 2919.17 and 2919.18 of the Revised Code to revise the criminal laws governing post-viability abortions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To revise the criminal laws governing post-viability abortions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-06 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-03-31 Committee Report
2011-02-10 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2011-02-10 Introduced to House
2011-04-07 To Criminal Justice
2011-04-07 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2305Amended CodeCitation Text
230511Amended CodeCitation Text
2307Amended CodeCitation Text
230752Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2919Amended CodeCitation Text
291916Amended CodeCitation Text
291917Repealed CodeCitation Text
2919171New CodeSee Bill Text
291918Repealed CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback