OH SB63 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 301.28 and 4301.62 and to enact sections 5.2319, 5.2532, and 4303.186 of the Revised Code to create the D-9 liquor permit, which authorizes an establishment to sell beer, wine, and mixed beverages for on-premises consumption under specified circumstances, to allow a board of county commissioners to authorize a county department of probation to accept payments by credit card, and to make multiple designations.
Title
Allow county probation department to accept credit card payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | House | Passed |
2022-12-13 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2021-05-04 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported: Local Government and Elections |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Liquor Control : Liquor Permits and Quotas
State and Local Government : Local Government
Liquor Control : Liquor Permits and Quotas
State and Local Government : Local Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 01 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 186 | New Code | See Bill Text |