OH SB42 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-7)
Status: Passed on December 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 145.012, 145.09, 145.191, 145.194, 145.28, 145.29, 145.295, 145.297, 145.2914, 145.2915, 145.31, 145.311, 145.33, 145.35, 145.362, 145.363, 145.37, 145.384, 145.391, 145.40, 145.43, 145.431, 145.45, 145.46, 145.563, 145.58, 145.581, 145.584, 145.63, 145.64, 145.82, 145.88, 145.92, 145.95, 171.04, 311.01, 742.53, 742.63, 3301.079, 3307.04, 3307.35, 3307.39, 3307.41, 3307.56, 3307.563, 3307.57, 3307.58, 3307.62, 3307.66, 3307.70, 3307.71, 3307.711, 3307.73, 3309.01, 3309.11, 3309.26, 3309.261, 3309.28, 3309.301, 3309.35, 3309.381, 3309.42, 3309.45, 3309.49, 3309.51, 3309.55, 3309.56, 3309.57, 3309.571, 3309.691, 3309.82, 5505.03, 5505.04, 5505.12, 5505.14, 5505.15, 5505.16, 5505.17, 5505.174, 5505.18, 5505.33, 5505.34, 5505.59, and 5705.21; to enact sections 4113.75 and 5505.112 and new sections 145.402, 3307.561, and 3309.43; and to repeal sections 145.402, 3307.561, and 3309.43 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing Ohio's public retirement systems, to allow a private sector employer to automatically deduct from an employee's compensation contributions to an employee retirement plan or program, to change the optional qualifications to be eligible for the office of sheriff, and to authorize school districts with a safety and security tax levy to report how the district is using funding from that levy to the Ohio Department of Education.
Title
To revise the law governing Ohio's public retirement systems, to allow a private sector employer to automatically deduct from an employee's compensation contributions to an employee retirement plan or program, to change the optional qualifications to be eligible for the office of sheriff, and to authorize school districts with a safety and security tax levy to report how the district is using funding from that levy to the Ohio Department of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-30 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-11 | Concurrence | |
2013-04-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-03-19 | Committee Report | |
2013-02-14 | To Ways & Means | |
2013-02-14 | Introduced to House | |
2014-12-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-09 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-04-16 | To *Rules and Reference | |
2013-04-16 | Introduced to Senate |