OH SB3 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 101.35, 103.0511, 107.52, 107.53, 107.54, 107.55, 107.62, 107.63, 111.15, 119.01, 119.03, 119.04, 121.39, 121.73, 121.74, 121.81, 121.82, 121.83, 121.91, 127.18, 1531.08, 3319.22, 3319.221, 3333.021, 3333.048, 3701.34, 3737.88, 3746.04, 4117.02, 4141.14, 5103.0325, 5117.02, 5703.14, 6111.31, and 6111.51; to enact sections 101.351, 106.01, 106.02, 106.021, 106.022, 106.023, 106.03, 106.031, 106.04, 106.041, 106.042, 106.05, 121.811, and 3345.033; and to repeal sections 119.031 and 119.032 of the Revised Code to revise rule-making and rule review procedures and to make administrative reforms.
Title
To revise rule-making and rule review procedures and to make administrative reforms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2013-06-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-06-19 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-02-12 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2013-02-12 | Introduced to House | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-21 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-06-26 | To State and Local Government | |
2013-06-26 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 01 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 01 | 351 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 03 | 0511 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 03 | 055 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 06 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 021 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 022 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 023 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 041 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 042 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 07 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 07 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 07 | 54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 07 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 07 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 07 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 07 | 631 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 11 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 13 | 091 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 17 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 19 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 19 | 031 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
1 | 19 | 032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 19 | 033 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 19 | 034 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 19 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 21 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 74 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 811 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | 82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | 91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 26 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 27 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
15 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
15 | 31 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 19 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 33 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 33 | 048 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 45 | 033 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 01 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 37 | 88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 46 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 46 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 17 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 41 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
51 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 03 | 0325 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
51 | 17 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 03 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
61 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
61 | 11 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 11 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |