OH SB27 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective 4/6/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Effective 4/6/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2317.56, 3701.341, and 3701.79 and to enact sections 3726.01, 3726.02, 3726.03, 3726.04, 3726.041, 3726.042, 3726.05, 3726.09, 3726.10, 3726.11, 3726.12, 3726.13, 3726.14, 3726.15, 3726.16, 3726.95, 3726.99, and 4717.271 of the Revised Code to impose requirements on the final disposition of fetal remains from surgical abortions.
Title
Regards disposition of fetal remains from surgical abortion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Effective 4/6/21 | |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2020-12-03 | House | Passed |
2020-12-03 | House | Reported - Amended: Civil Justice |
2019-04-02 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 17 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 01 | 341 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 01 | 79 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 26 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 041 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 042 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 26 | 99 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
47 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 17 | 271 | New Code | See Bill Text |