OH SB22 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-27)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 52-27)
Status: Passed on September 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 6111.60 of the Revised Code to require the Director of Environmental Protection to consider, to the extent allowable under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act, specified factors before issuing NPDES permits for publicly owned sewerage systems, requiring and approving long-term control plans for wet weather discharges from publicly owned sewerage systems, and enforcing provisions of that Act as applied to publicly owned sewerage systems.
Title
To require the Director of Environmental Protection to consider, to the extent allowable under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act, specified factors before issuing NPDES permits for publicly owned sewerage systems, requiring and approving long-term control plans for wet weather discharges from publicly owned sewerage systems, and enforcing provisions of that Act as applied to publicly owned sewerage systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-30 | Effective Date | |
2011-06-30 | Governor' Action | |
2011-07-04 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-06-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-06-15 | Concurrence | |
2011-03-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-03-01 | Committee Report | |
2011-02-01 | To Agriculture, Environment & Natural Resources | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced to House | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-03-10 | To Agriculture & Natural Resources | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
61 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 11 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text |