OH SB214 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2953.36 of the Revised Code to allow a victim of human trafficking to expunge certain criminal records.
Title
Allow human trafficking victim to expunge certain records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Introduced |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported: Judiciary |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Referred to committee: Judiciary |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Criminal Records Checks
Senate Judiciary Committee
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Criminal Records Checks
Senate Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 53 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |