OH SB209 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact sections 5533.097 and 5533.609 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of State Route 58 within Lorain County as the "Sgt. Louis Torres Memorial Highway" and to designate a portion of Interstate Route 270 in Franklin County as the "Army Specialist Nicholaus E. Zimmer Memorial Highway."
Title
To designate a portion of State Route 58 within Lorain County as the "Sgt. Louis Torres Memorial Highway" and to designate a portion of Interstate Route 270 in Franklin County as the "Army Specialist Nicholaus E. Zimmer Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-03-11 | Governor' Action | |
2014-03-18 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-03-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-02-26 | Concurrence | |
2014-01-29 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-01-22 | Committee Report | |
2013-10-22 | To Transportation | |
2013-10-22 | Introduced to House | |
2014-02-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-19 | Committee Report - A | |
2014-01-30 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2014-01-30 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 33 | 097 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 609 | New Code | See Bill Text |