OH SB187 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5534.52 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of the Nelsonville Bypass of United States Route 33 as the "State Senator C. Stanley Mechem Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates memorial highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-12-14 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Passed |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 34 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |