OH SB173 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4301.171, 4303.184, 4303.208, and 4303.251 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing tasting samples of beer and intoxicating liquor and to allow an F-6 liquor permit to be issued for the same location as an F-8 liquor permit, provided that the two permits are not exercised concurrently.
Title
To modify the law governing tasting samples of beer and intoxicating liquor and to allow an F-6 liquor permit to be issued for the same location as an F-8 liquor permit, provided that the two permits are not exercised concurrently.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Governor' Action | |
2014-04-19 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-04-08 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-04-01 | Concurrence | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-21 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-08-08 | To Agriculture | |
2013-08-08 | Introduced to House | |
2014-03-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-03-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-12-10 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2013-12-10 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
43 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
43 | 01 | 171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
43 | 03 | 184 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |