OH SB168 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Referred to committee: Primary and Secondary Education
Pending: House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Referred to committee: Primary and Secondary Education
Pending: House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.0714, 3301.28, 3302.03, 3302.12, 3302.151, 3307.353, 3309.345, 3311.80, 3312.02, 3313.26, 3313.413, 3313.48, 3313.92, 3313.984, 3314.012, 3314.015, 3314.016, 3314.017, 3314.0211, 3314.03, 3314.11, 3314.29, 3314.35, 3319.077, 3319.0811, 3319.111, 3319.112, 3319.172, 3319.22, 3319.2210, 3319.27, 3319.291, 3319.316, 3319.391, 3326.11, 3327.01, 3327.021, and 5502.70; to enact sections 3302.421, 3314.252, 3319.225, and 3319.273; and to repeal sections 3301.0717, 3301.131, 3301.134, 3301.14, 3301.30, 3302.22, 3313.6015, 3314.20, 3317.50, 3317.51, 3319.234, 3319.55, 3319.56, and 3319.57 of the Revised Code with regard to education regulation reform and notice requirements for certain reemployed retirants and to amend the versions of sections 3301.0714 and 3314.03 of the Revised Code that are scheduled to take effect January 1, 2025, to continue the changes on and after that effective date.
Title
Regards education regulation reform
Sponsors
Sen. Michele Reynolds [R] | Sen. Andrew Brenner [R] | Sen. Jerry Cirino [R] | Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R] |
Sen. Bill Reineke [R] | Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2023-12-19 | House | Introduced |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Passed |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Education |
2023-10-11 | Senate | Referred to committee: Education |
2023-10-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Education
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Senate Education Committee
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
House Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Senate Education Committee