OH HB567 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on December 4 2012 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-12-05 - To Health, Human Services, & Aging
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 1701.03, 1705.03, 1705.04, 1705.53, 1785.01, 1785.02, 1785.03, 2305.234, 2305.51, 2921.22, 3107.014, 3701.74, 3721.21, 4723.16, 4725.33, 4729.161, 4731.226, 4731.65, 4732.28, 4734.17, 4755.471, 4757.03, 4757.10, 4757.16, 4757.22, 4757.23, 4757.27, 4757.28, 4757.29, 4757.30, 4757.31, 4757.33, 4757.36, 4757.41, 5101.61, and 5123.61; to enact sections 4757.13 and 4757.37; and to repeal section 4757.12 of the Revised Code to modify counselor, social worker, and marriage and family therapist licensing law; to provide certain professional rights to such licensees; and to permit the Department of Developmental Disabilities to conduct assessments of residents of intermediate care facilities for individuals with intellectual disabilities, for the first quarter of calendar year 2013.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To modify counselor, social worker, and marriage and family therapist licensing law; to provide certain professional rights to such licensees; and to permit the Department of Developmental Disabilities to conduct assessments of residents of intermediate care facilities for individuals with intellectual disabilities, for the first quarter of calendar year 2013.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-04 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-05 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2012-12-05 Introduced to Senate
2012-12-04 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-11-29 Committee Report - S
2012-06-13 To Health & Aging
2012-06-13 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1701Amended CodeCitation Text
170103Amended CodeCitation Text
1705Amended CodeCitation Text
170503Amended CodeCitation Text
170504Amended CodeCitation Text
170553Amended CodeCitation Text
1785Amended CodeCitation Text
178501Amended CodeCitation Text
178502Amended CodeCitation Text
178503Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2305Amended CodeCitation Text
2305234Amended CodeCitation Text
230551Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2921Amended CodeCitation Text
292122Amended CodeCitation Text
31Amended CodeCitation Text
3107Amended CodeCitation Text
3107014Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3701Amended CodeCitation Text
370174Amended CodeCitation Text
3721Amended CodeCitation Text
372121Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4723Amended CodeCitation Text
472316Amended CodeCitation Text
4725Amended CodeCitation Text
472533Amended CodeCitation Text
4729Amended CodeCitation Text
4729161Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
4731226Amended CodeCitation Text
473165Amended CodeCitation Text
4732Amended CodeCitation Text
473228Amended CodeCitation Text
4734Amended CodeCitation Text
473417Amended CodeCitation Text
4755Amended CodeCitation Text
4755471Amended CodeCitation Text
4757Amended CodeCitation Text
475703Amended CodeCitation Text
475710Amended CodeCitation Text
475712Repealed CodeCitation Text
475713New CodeSee Bill Text
475716Amended CodeCitation Text
475722Amended CodeCitation Text
475723Amended CodeCitation Text
475727Amended CodeCitation Text
475728Amended CodeCitation Text
475729Amended CodeCitation Text
475730Amended CodeCitation Text
475731Amended CodeCitation Text
475733Amended CodeCitation Text
475736Amended CodeCitation Text
475737New CodeSee Bill Text
475741Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5101Amended CodeCitation Text
510161Amended CodeCitation Text
5123Amended CodeCitation Text
512361Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback