OH HB535 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Status: Engrossed on June 13 2012 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend section 2933.52 of the Revised Code to exempt under certain circumstances a parent or a person acting in loco parentis from the prohibition of the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To exempt under certain circumstances a parent or a person acting in loco parentis from the prohibition of the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-13 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-19 To Judiciary
2012-06-19 Introduced to Senate
2012-06-13 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-23 Committee Report - S
2012-05-03 To Judiciary & Ethics
2012-05-03 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2933Amended CodeCitation Text
293352Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback