OH HB495 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 105.41, 109.69, 109.731, 152.08, 311.41, 311.42, 1547.69, 2921.13, 2923.11, 2923.12, 2923.121, 2923.122, 2923.123, 2923.124, 2923.125, 2923.126, 2923.127, 2923.128, 2923.129, 2923.1210, 2923.1211, 2923.1213, 2923.16, and 2953.37 of the Revised Code to repeal the competency certification currently required for renewal of a concealed handgun license; to revise the definition of "unloaded" that applies to the offense of "improperly handling firearms in a motor vehicle" and the related vessel-based offense; to specify the authority of any person to store a firearm in the Statehouse Underground Parking Garage or the Riffe Center Parking Garage; and to simplify, through the use of new definitions, the law regarding concealed handgun licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To repeal the competency certification currently required for renewal of a concealed handgun license; to revise the definition of "unloaded" that applies to the offense of "improperly handling firearms in a motor vehicle" and the related vessel-based offense; to specify the authority of any person to store a firearm in the Statehouse Underground Parking Garage or the Riffe Center Parking Garage; and to simplify, through the use of new definitions, the law regarding concealed handgun licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-27 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-31 End of 10-day period
2012-12-19 Sent to Governor
2012-12-13 Concurrence
2012-12-13 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-12 Committee Report - S
2012-06-19 To Judiciary
2012-06-19 Introduced to Senate
2012-06-13 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-06-13 Committee Report - A
2012-03-27 To State Government & Elections
2012-03-27 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
105Amended CodeCitation Text
10541Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
10969Amended CodeCitation Text
109731Amended CodeCitation Text
152Amended CodeCitation Text
15208Amended CodeCitation Text
15Amended CodeCitation Text
1547Amended CodeCitation Text
154769Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2921Amended CodeCitation Text
292113Amended CodeCitation Text
2923Amended CodeCitation Text
292311Amended CodeCitation Text
292312Amended CodeCitation Text
2923121Amended CodeCitation Text
29231210Amended CodeCitation Text
29231211Amended CodeCitation Text
29231213Amended CodeCitation Text
2923122Amended CodeCitation Text
2923123Amended CodeCitation Text
2923124Amended CodeCitation Text
2923125Amended CodeCitation Text
2923126Amended CodeCitation Text
2923127Amended CodeCitation Text
2923128Amended CodeCitation Text
2923129Amended CodeCitation Text
292316Amended CodeCitation Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295337Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
311Amended CodeCitation Text
31141Amended CodeCitation Text
31142Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback