OH HB431 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-25)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 42-25)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 119.062, 2152.021, 2905.32, 2907.24, 2929.01, 2929.17, 2950.01, 2953.32, 2953.36, 4510.07, and 4510.13 and to enact sections 2907.231 and 2950.151 of the Revised Code to require a juvenile court in specified circumstances to hold a delinquency complaint in abeyance in certain prostitution or human trafficking cases, to provide that the trafficking in persons elements that apply to a victim under age 16 also apply to a victim who is age 16 or 17, to prohibit a person from engaging in prostitution, to modify certain soliciting offenses and penalties, and to modify Sex Offender Registration and Notification Law and Conviction Record Sealing Law provisions regarding certain "unlawful sexual conduct with a minor" convictions.
Title
Create Sexual Exploitation Database
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective 4/12/21 | |
2020-12-22 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Passed |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-05-28 | House | Passed |
2020-05-28 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2019-12-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-11-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Criminal Records Checks
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Sex Offenses
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Criminal Records Checks
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Sex Offenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 19 | 062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 52 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 05 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 07 | 231 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 07 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | 151 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 53 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |