OH HB380 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact sections 2307.951, 2307.952, 2307.953, and 2307.954 of the Revised Code to require claimants in asbestos tort actions to make certain disclosures pertaining to asbestos trust claims that have been submitted to asbestos trust entities for the purpose of compensating the claimant for asbestos exposure.
Title
To require claimants in asbestos tort actions to make certain disclosures pertaining to asbestos trust claims that have been submitted to asbestos trust entities for the purpose of compensating the claimant for asbestos exposure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-11 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-11 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-05 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-05 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-01-26 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-01-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-01-11 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-11-15 | To Judiciary & Ethics | |
2011-11-15 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
23 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 07 | 951 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 07 | 952 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 07 | 953 | New Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 07 | 954 | New Code | See Bill Text |