OH HB379 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 4909.05, 4909.06, 4909.07, 4909.08, 4909.15, 4909.156, 4909.172, 4909.18, 4909.191, and 4909.42 of the Revised Code to permit, for water-works and sewage disposal system companies, certain rate-calculation adjustments, to make changes regarding water and sewer infrastructure improvement surcharges, and to alter language regarding utility requirements for when rate increases may take effect in the absence of administrative action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To permit, for water-works and sewage disposal system companies, certain rate-calculation adjustments, to make changes regarding water and sewer infrastructure improvement surcharges, and to alter language regarding utility requirements for when rate increases may take effect in the absence of administrative action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-05 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-27 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-27 End of 10-day period
2012-12-14 Sent to Governor
2012-12-05 Concurrence
2012-12-05 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-05 Committee Report
2012-05-10 To Energy & Public Utilities
2012-05-10 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-09 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-03-28 Committee Report - S
2011-11-15 To Public Utilities
2011-11-15 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
49Amended CodeCitation Text
4909Amended CodeCitation Text
490905Amended CodeCitation Text
490906Amended CodeCitation Text
490907Amended CodeCitation Text
490908Amended CodeCitation Text
490915Amended CodeCitation Text
4909156Amended CodeCitation Text
4909172Amended CodeCitation Text
4909173New CodeSee Bill Text
490918Amended CodeCitation Text
4909191Amended CodeCitation Text
490942Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback