OH HB36 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-22)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-22)
Status: Passed on December 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-18 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact sections 5533.462, 5533.463, and 5533.812 of the Revised Code to designate the "Southern Ohio Veterans Memorial Highway," the "Specialist 4 Samuel A. Johnson Memorial Highway," and the "Oakley C. Collins Memorial Bridge."
Title
To designate the "Southern Ohio Veterans Memorial Highway," the "Specialist 4 Samuel A. Johnson Memorial Highway," and the "Oakley C. Collins Memorial Bridge."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-18 | Governor' Action | |
2014-12-29 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-12-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-12-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-12-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-11-19 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-05-09 | To Transportation | |
2013-05-09 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-05-08 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-04-10 | Committee Report | |
2013-02-05 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2013-02-05 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
55 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
55 | 33 | 051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 33 | 462 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 463 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 812 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 33 | 831 | New Code | See Bill Text |