OH HB342 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend Section 263.325 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly to permit an educational service center to be a partner or the lead applicant of an education consortium seeking a grant under the Straight A Program, to modify the goals of projects supported by the program, to make other changes regarding the operation of the program, and to declare an emergency.
Title
To amend Section 263.325 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly to permit an educational service center to be a partner or the lead applicant of an education consortium seeking a grant under the Straight A Program, to modify the goals of projects supported by the program, to make other changes regarding the operation of the program, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House - Emergency clause stood (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House - Emergency clause stood (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Effective Date | |
2014-03-11 | Governor' Action | |
2014-03-18 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-03-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-02-26 | Concurrence | |
2014-02-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-20 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-01-16 | To Education | |
2014-01-16 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-01-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-12-05 | Committee Report - A | |
2013-11-07 | To Education | |
2013-11-07 | Introduced to House |