OH HB31 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.092 of the Revised Code to designate "Hang on Sloopy," which includes the following lyrics, as the official state rock song: Hang on Sloopy, Sloopy hang on; Sloopy lives in a very bad part of town; All the girls I know they try to put my Sloopy down; Sloopy, I don't care what your daddy do; Don't you know little girl, I'm in love with you; Sloopy, let your hair down, let it down on me; Come on Sloopy let your hair down, Girl it down on me.
Title
Designates Hang on Sloopy as state rock song
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed |
2015-03-02 | House | Reported: State Government |
2015-02-10 | House | To committee: State Government |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced |