OH HB30 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 29 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3301.07, 3301.16, 3302.05, 3302.07, 3306.01, 3306.02, 3306.05, 3306.06, 3306.07, 3306.08, 3306.09, 3306.091, 3306.10, 3315.18, 3315.19, 3316.06, 3316.16, 3317.018, 3317.024, 3321.01, and 3321.05; to enact section 3301.96; and to repeal sections 3306.18, 3306.25, 3306.30, 3306.31, 3306.33, 3306.34, 3306.35, 3306.40, 3313.821, 3313.822, 3315.17, 3315.171, and 3318.312 of the Revised Code; and to repeal Section 265.70.70 of Am. Sub. H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly and Section 9 of Sub. H.B. 318 of the 128th General Assembly to eliminate spending and reporting requirements related to the school funding system, to eliminate the prohibition on unit funding for gifted student services effective after fiscal year 2011, to eliminate the requirement that school districts offer all-day kindergarten, to eliminate the requirement that school districts annually set aside operating funds for textbooks and instructional materials, and to eliminate the requirement that school districts establish family and civic engagement teams except as required for implementation of federal "Race to the Top" grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

; and to repeal Section 265.70.70 of Am. Sub. H.B. 1 of the 128th General Assembly and Section 9 of Sub. H.B. 318 of the 128th General Assembly to eliminate spending and reporting requirements related to the school funding system, to eliminate the prohibition on unit funding for gifted student services effective after fiscal year 2011, to eliminate the requirement that school districts offer all-day kindergarten, to eliminate the requirement that school districts annually set aside operating funds for textbooks and instructional materials, and to eliminate the requirement that school districts establish family and civic engagement teams except as required for implementation of federal "Race to the Top" grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-16 - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - Third Consideration (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - Amendment (Y: 37 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-16 - House - Amendment (Y: 39 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-16 - House - Amendment (Y: 36 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-29 Effective Date
2011-03-30 Governor' Action
2011-03-16 Concurrence
2011-03-15 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-03-15 Committee Report - A
2011-02-17 To Education
2011-02-17 Introduced to Senate
2011-02-16 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-02-10 Committee Report - S
2011-01-18 To Education
2011-01-18 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3301Amended CodeCitation Text
330107Amended CodeCitation Text
330116Amended CodeCitation Text
330196New CodeSee Bill Text
3302Amended CodeCitation Text
330205Amended CodeCitation Text
330207Amended CodeCitation Text
3306Amended CodeCitation Text
330601Amended CodeCitation Text
330602Amended CodeCitation Text
330605Amended CodeCitation Text
330606Amended CodeCitation Text
330607Amended CodeCitation Text
330608Amended CodeCitation Text
330609Amended CodeCitation Text
3306091Amended CodeCitation Text
330610Amended CodeCitation Text
330618Repealed CodeCitation Text
330625Repealed CodeCitation Text
330629Repealed CodeCitation Text
3306291Repealed CodeCitation Text
3306292Repealed CodeCitation Text
330630Repealed CodeCitation Text
330631Repealed CodeCitation Text
330633Repealed CodeCitation Text
330634Repealed CodeCitation Text
330635Repealed CodeCitation Text
330640Repealed CodeCitation Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
3313489Amended CodeCitation Text
3313821Repealed CodeCitation Text
3313822Repealed CodeCitation Text
3315Amended CodeCitation Text
331517Repealed CodeCitation Text
3315171Repealed CodeCitation Text
331518Amended CodeCitation Text
331519Amended CodeCitation Text
3316Amended CodeCitation Text
3316031Amended CodeCitation Text
3316043Amended CodeCitation Text
331606Amended CodeCitation Text
331608Amended CodeCitation Text
331616Amended CodeCitation Text
3317Amended CodeCitation Text
3317018Amended CodeCitation Text
3317024Amended CodeCitation Text
3318Repealed CodeCitation Text
3318312Repealed CodeCitation Text
3321Amended CodeCitation Text
332101Amended CodeCitation Text
332105Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5705Amended CodeCitation Text
5705391Amended CodeCitation Text
5705412Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback