OH HB238 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Referred to committee: Government Oversight
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Referred to committee: Government Oversight
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 101.62, 103.27, 926.12, 926.19, 3703.21, 3769.03, 3772.13, 4104.07, 4104.08, 4104.18, 4517.02, 4517.04, 4517.10, 4517.14, 4517.15, 4517.20, 4517.33, 4517.43, 4549.50, 4703.16, 4735.01, 4735.07, 4735.09, 4738.05, 4749.03, 4763.05, 4763.06, 4763.07, 4763.08, 4763.09, 4781.08, 4781.17, and 5120.10; to enact new section 926.30 and sections 3769.031 and 4743.06; and to repeal sections 926.30 and 4517.09 of the Revised Code to revise and streamline the state's occupational regulations.
Title
Regards occupational regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to committee: Government Oversight |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-02-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2023-09-12 | House | Referred to committee: State and Local Government |
2023-07-11 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
House State and Local Government Committee
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Government Oversight Committee
State and Local Government : State Government
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Government Oversight Committee
State and Local Government : State Government